Multiplikation und Addition

++Übungszettel

  1. 12*4+67=
  2. 89+2345*19=
  3. 234+76*3=
  4. 4*67+9349=
  5. 321*697+8323=
  6. 43564+5643*437=
  7. 849*231+8656=
  8. 367578+302498*7=
  9. 157*578*2+5453=
Unless otherwise stated, the content of this page is licensed under Creative Commons Attribution-ShareAlike 3.0 License